**Multiplication table** **of** **25** is in the tabular form. So, you can get it easily.

In the table of 25 given below, you can see numerals on the left side and how to learn or read is on the right side. So, this is the right way to understand and learn the table.

As this table is of 25: in the part of numerals, we have the number 25 and the results by multiplying factors from 1 to 20. So, we get the results from 1 to 20.

Now let’s see how to learn-

## Table of 25 in Tabular Form

| Numerals | Read as |

1. | 25 x 1 = 25 | Twenty-five ones are twenty-five |

2. | 25 x 2 = 50 | Twenty-five twos are fifty |

3. | 25 x 3 = 75 | Twenty-five threes are seventy-five |

4. | 25 x 4 = 100 | Twenty-five fours are hundred |

5. | 25 x 5 = 125 | Twenty-five fives are hundred and twenty-five |

6. | 25 x 6 = 150 | Twenty-five sixes are hundred and fifty |

7. | 25 x 7 = 175 | Twenty-five sevens are hundred and seventy-five |

8. | 25 x 8 = 200 | Twenty-five eights are two hundred |

9. | 25 x 9 = 225 | Twenty-five nines are two hundred and twenty-five |

10. | 25 x 10 = 250 | Twenty-five tens are two hundred and fifty |

11. | 25 x 11 = 275 | Twenty-five elevens are two hundred and seventy-five |

12. | 25 x 12 = 300 | Twenty-five twelves are three hundred |

13. | 25 x 13 = 325 | Twenty-five thirteens are three hundred and twenty-five |

14. | 25 x 14 = 350 | Twenty-five fourteens are three hundred and fifty |

15. | 25 x 15 = 375 | Twenty-five fifteens are three hundred and seventy-five |

16. | 25 x 16 = 400 | Twenty-five sixteens are four hundred |

17. | 25 x 17 = 425 | Twenty-five seventeens are four hundred and twenty-five |

18. | 25 x 18 = 450 | Twenty-five eighteens are four hundred and fifty |

19. | 25 x 19 = 475 | Twenty-five nineteens are four hundred and seventy-five |

20. | 25 x 20 = 500 | Twenty-five twenties are five hundred |

### Get more tables other than a table of 25-

You may also like to learn the terms given below-

**Multiplication Table of 25** to List of Chapters in Mathematics